PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. v. NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.
Defendant: GUY IRONI, NEW JERSEY FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC D/B/A NUTRIFRESH SERVICES A/D/B/A NUTRIFRESH, JOSHUA ABRAMSON, NUTRIFRESH HPP LLC, NUTRIFRESH HOLDINGS LLC and NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv15337
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JOSHUA ABRAMSON for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (JB, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Default by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. against Joshua Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(BODNER, JONATHAN)
November 29, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC d/b/a NUTRIFRESH SERVICES a/d/b/a NUTRIFESH for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (JB, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Default by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. against NJ Frozen Storage Services LLC d/b/a Nutrifresh Services a/d/b/a Nutrifesh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(BODNER, JONATHAN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. GUY IRONI served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. JOSHUA ABRAMSON served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
October 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOSHUA ABRAMSON, GUY IRONI, NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC, NUTRIFRESH HOLDINGS LLC, NUTRIFRESH HPP LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9125322), filed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BODNER, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. v. NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY IRONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC D/B/A NUTRIFRESH SERVICES A/D/B/A NUTRIFRESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA ABRAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRIFRESH HPP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRIFRESH HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJ FROZEN STORAGE SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN S. BODNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?