MCCLENDON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCCLENDON
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2018cv15353
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Answer ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(ROSE, HERSCHEL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM MCCLENDON. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/22/2018. (DUCKWORTH, JAMES)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9126600) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM MCCLENDON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(DUCKWORTH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLENDON v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCCLENDON
Represented By: JAMES M. DUCKWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: HERSCHEL PAUL ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?