NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND et al v. PERRIGO COMPANY PLC et al
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND and NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST, on behalf of its series NVIT DYNAMIC U.S. GROWTH FUND, NVIT MULTI-MANAGER LARGE CAP VALUE FUND, NVIT S&P 500 INDEX FUND, and TEMPLETON NVIT INTERNATIONAL VALUE FUN
Defendant: JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C. PAPA and PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv15382
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Samuel P. Groner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Anklam to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James D. Wareham to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
December 4, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to James D. Wareham, James E. Anklam and Samuel P. Groner: $ 450, receipt number NEW038108 (sm,)
November 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims from Plaintiffs' Complaints. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
November 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JOHN L. HARDIMAN, ESQ. $ 150, receipt number NEW038041 (sm)
November 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MICHAEL P. DEVLIN, ESQ., $ 150, receipt number NEW038040 (sm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the foregoing Individual Actions Discovery Schedule is Approved and the foregoing Individual Actions Discovery Plan is Approved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/26/2018. (sm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER admitting James D. Wareham, Esq., James E. Anklam, Esq. and Samuel P. Groner, Esq. pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Perrigo Company PLC; they shall each pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; and shall each make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/27/2018. (sm)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 Letter from Alan S. Naar. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Alan S. Naar, #2 Certification of James D. Wareham, #3 Certification of James E. Anklam, #4 Certification Samuel P. Groner, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(NAAR, ALAN)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN L. HARDIMAN,ESQ. and MICHAEL P. DEVLIN, ESQ., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/21/2018. (gl, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 Letter from Joseph T. Kelleher re Discovery Schedule and Plan. (KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims from Plaintiffs' Complaints by JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C. PAPA, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC. Responses due by 1/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Samuel P. Groner, #3 Exhibit 1 to Groner Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Groner Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Groner Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Groner Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5-10 to Groner Declaration, #8 Exhibit 11-18 to Groner Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(NAAR, ALAN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JUDY L. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief Is Necessary, #2 Certification of Brian Frawley, #3 Certification of John Hardiman, #4 Certification of Michael Devlin, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY on behalf of JUDY L. BROWN (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from James D. Wareham and Alan S. Naar Re: Discovery Issues. (NAAR, ALAN)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Reed Brodsky, Esq., Aric Wu, Esq. and David F. Crowley-Buck, Esq. pro hac vice admission; they shall each pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/19/2018. (sm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Marshall R. King to the Honorable Lena Dunn Wettre re: request for admission pro hac vice. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marshall R. King, #2 Certification of Reed Brodsky, #3 Certification of Aric H. Wu, #4 Certification of David F. Crowley-Buck, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(KING, MARSHALL)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARSHALL R. KING on behalf of JOSEPH C. PAPA (KING, MARSHALL)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Joseph T. Kelleher on behalf of the Nationwide Plaintiffs Regarding Discovery Issues. (KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERRIGO COMPANY PLC. (NAAR, ALAN)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 11/20/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/5/2018. (sm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA R. PARKER on behalf of NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND, NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST, on behalf of its series NVIT DYNAMIC U.S. GROWTH FUND, NVIT MULTI-MANAGER LARGE CAP VALUE FUND, NVIT S&P 500 INDEX FUND, and TEMPLETON NVIT INTERNATIONAL VALUE FUN (PARKER, MARISSA)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Alan S. Naar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(NAAR, ALAN)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN S. NAAR on behalf of PERRIGO COMPANY PLC (NAAR, ALAN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C. PAPA, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
October 29, 2018 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C. PAPA, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9129194) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND, NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST, on behalf of its series NVIT DYNAMIC U.S. GROWTH FUND, NVIT MULTI-MANAGER LARGE CAP VALUE FUND, NVIT S&P 500 INDEX FUND, and TEMPLETON NVIT INTERNATIONAL VALUE FUN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KELLEHER, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND et al v. PERRIGO COMPANY PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FUNDS, on behalf of its series NATIONWIDE GENEVA MID CAP GROWTH FUND and NATIONWIDE S&P 500 INDEX FUND
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: MARISSA R. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE VARIABLE INSURANCE TRUST, on behalf of its series NVIT DYNAMIC U.S. GROWTH FUND, NVIT MULTI-MANAGER LARGE CAP VALUE FUND, NVIT S&P 500 INDEX FUND, and TEMPLETON NVIT INTERNATIONAL VALUE FUN
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: MARISSA R. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY L. BROWN
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH C. PAPA
Represented By: MARSHALL R. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Represented By: ALAN S. NAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?