BRISKIN v. SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Briskin
Defendant: SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, SONY ELECTRONICS INC. and SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2018cv15404
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/27/18. (nm, )
November 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint and the notice of removal document Number 1 submitted by Robert Hafner on October 29, 2018 appears to have address information for Domenic B. Sanginiti that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ys, )
November 3, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
October 30, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ELECTRONICS INC. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey (Bergen County), case number BER-L-1461-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9131383), filed by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint served on Sony Energy Devices Corporation, #2 Exhibit A1 - Plaintiff's Orignial Complaint, #3 Exhibit A2 - Sony Corporation of America Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #4 Exhibit A3 - Sony Electronics Inc. Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #5 Exhibit B - Sony Corporation of America Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit C - Sony Electronics Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Completed Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Declaration Sony Energy Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #9 Declaration Sony Corporation of Americal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #10 Declaration Sony Electronics Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form)(HAFNER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRISKIN v. SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY ELECTRONICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Briskin
Represented By: DOMENIC B. SANGINITI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?