CHOU v. JPMORGAN CHASE
Plaintiff: XIAO-WEI CHOU
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv15407
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David C. Grossman, Esq to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9242555.) (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
December 14, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEAN FAN KUEI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xiao Wei Chou as to JPMORGAN CHASE via post office RRR mail served on 11/30/2018. (JB, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jean Fan Kuei to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9241137.) (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean Fan Kuei; counsel shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with Local Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 12/11/2018. (sms)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER admitting David Charles Grossman pro hac vice; shall pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 12/11/2018. (sm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jean Fan Kuei by JPMORGAN CHASE, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jean Fan Kuei, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David C. Grossman by JPMORGAN CHASE, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Grossman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co as Corporate Parent.. (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMORGAN CHASE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW037796) with JURY DEMAND, filed by XIAO-WEI CHOU. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(as, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHOU v. JPMORGAN CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIAO-WEI CHOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE
Represented By: MATTHEW D. STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: MATTHEW D. STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?