BSIG, LLC v. LOG STORM SECURITY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BSIG, LLC
Defendant: DALE W. CLINE, LOG STORM SECURITY, INC. and JEFFREY T. RONEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv15660
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by JEFFREY T. RONEY. JEFFREY T. RONEY served on 12/3/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (HUTNER, ERIC)
December 14, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by JEFFREY T. RONEY, LOG STORM SECURITY, INC., DALE W. CLINE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/15/2019. (sms)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.1(b); Defendants Log Storm, Cline, and Roncy be permitted to file a responsive Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead with respect to the Complaint until and including January 15, 2019; the uploading of this Order on CM/ECF will effect service upon all counsel of record; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/14/2018. (sms)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Jarrid H. Kantor, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Extending Time to Answer)(ANTONELLI, DANIEL)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by LOG STORM SECURITY, INC., DALE W. CLINE. LOG STORM SECURITY, INC. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; DALE W. CLINE served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Filing Letter)(ANTONELLI, DANIEL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DALE W. CLINE, LOG STORM SECURITY, INC., JEFFREY T. RONEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gl, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by BSIG, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (PITTA, THOMAS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by BSIG, LLC as to JEFFREY T RONEY. (PITTA, THOMAS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by BSIG, LLC as to DALE W. CLINE. (PITTA, THOMAS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by BSIG, LLC as to LOG STORM SECURITY D/B/A BLACKSTRATUS. (PITTA, THOMAS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by BSIG, LLC re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (PITTA, THOMAS)
November 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOG STORM SECURITY D/B/A BLACKSTRATUS, DALE W. CLINE, JEFFREY T RONEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9148139) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BSIG, LLC.(PITTA, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BSIG, LLC v. LOG STORM SECURITY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSIG, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS A. PITTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE W. CLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOG STORM SECURITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY T. RONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?