UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MINSK et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: STEPHEN MINSK, MARILYN MINSK and STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv15764
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to STEPHEN MINSK and the STATE OF NEW JERSEY for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dam, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Default by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against Stephen Minsk and the State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Miller)(MILLER, MATTHEW)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. STATE OF NEW JERSEY served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from MARILYN MINSK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. MARILYN MINSK served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. STEPHEN MINSK served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARILYN MINSK, STEPHEN MINSK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (fp, )
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARILYN MINSK, STEPHEN MINSK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MINSK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MINSK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN MINSK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MATTHEW BRYCE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?