MAYS v. EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Noreal Layne Mays
Defendant: EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., PAUL DEAN, ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), JANE DOES (1-10), JOHN DOES (1-10) and Paul Dean Gilbert, III
Case Number: 2:2018cv16043
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NOREAL LAYNE MAYS re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Noreal Mays, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(KASSIS, JAMES)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by UNITED AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certification)(FROME, CAROLYN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNITED AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
December 10, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 1/17/19 at 11:15am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/10/18. (tjg, )
December 7, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
December 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Noreal Layne Mays re #7 MOTION to Remand by NOREAL LAYNE MAYS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(KASSIS, JAMES)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Brief Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order)(KASSIS, JAMES)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by UNITED AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by NOREAL LAYNE MAYS.(KASSIS, JAMES)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC..(FROME, CAROLYN)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. identifying SkyWest, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FROME, CAROLYN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. identifying United Continental Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FROME, CAROLYN)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED AIRLINES, INC., EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-7617-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9164851), filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC., EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement United Airlines, Inc., #2 Statement ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., #3 Application for Clerk's Ext., #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Extra pleadings)(FROME, CAROLYN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAYS v. EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreal Layne Mays
Represented By: JAMES A. KASSIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN GERACI FROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: CAROLYN GERACI FROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dean Gilbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?