BUCHSPIES v. PFIZER, INC.

Plaintiff: JONATHAN BUCHSPIES
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv16083
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Joseph A Dickson
1 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JONATHAN BUCHSPIES. PFIZER, INC. waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PFIZER, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PFIZER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9166740) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JONATHAN BUCHSPIES.(BAIRD, GRAHAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCHSPIES v. PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN BUCHSPIES
Represented By: GRAHAM FAVILLE BAIRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?