WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND et al v. PERRIGO CO., PLC et al
Plaintiff: THE MERGER FUND VL, JNL/WESTCHESTER CAPITAL EVENT DRIVEN FUND, WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND, THE MERGER FUND and WCM MASTER TRUST
Defendant: PERRIGO CO., PLC, JOSEPH PAPA and JUDY BROWN
Case Number: 2:2018cv16204
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by JOSEPH PAPA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KING, MARSHALL)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by MARSHALL R. KING on behalf of JOSEPH PAPA (KING, MARSHALL)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PERRIGO CO., PLC.(NAAR, ALAN)
January 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JOHN L. HARDIMAN: $ 150, receipt number NEW038384 (dam, )
January 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MICHAEL P. DEVLIN: $ 150, receipt number NEW038385 (dam, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JUDY BROWN.(FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERRIGO CO., PLC. (NAAR, ALAN)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN L. HARDIMAN and MICHAEL P. DEVLIN. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/4/2019. (dam, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER. Defendants shall answer the Complaint on or before 1/11/2019. Discovery shall be coordinated with discovery in the Consolidated Class Action. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/4/2019. (dam, )
January 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JUDY BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Statement As To Why No Brief Is Necessary, #2 Certification of Brian Frawley, #3 Certification of John Hardiman, #4 Certification of Michael Devlin, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the 12/13/2018 Letter Orders in Mason and Pentwater are hereby modified to cancel the scheduling conferences in Mason and Pentwater scheduled for 1/17/2019 and 1/28/2019. The foregoing Individual Actions Discovery Schedule is APPROVED, and the foregoing Individual Actions Discovery Plan is APPROVED. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/2/2019. (dam, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants shall answer the Complaint on or before 1/11/2019. Discovery shall be coordinated with discovery in the Consolidated Class Action. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/20/2018. (dam, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY on behalf of JUDY BROWN (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from John A. Azzarello on behalf of all parties re: scheduling conferences and discovery plan. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by PERRIGO CO., PLC. (NAAR, ALAN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN S. NAAR on behalf of PERRIGO CO., PLC (NAAR, ALAN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUDY BROWN, JOSEPH PAPA, PERRIGO CO., PLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
November 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JNL/WESTCHESTER CAPITAL EVENT DRIVEN FUND identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE MERGER FUND VL identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE MERGER FUND identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WCM MASTER TRUST identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (AZZARELLO, JOHN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUDY BROWN, JOSEPH PAPA, PERRIGO CO., PLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9175816) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE MERGER FUND, WCM MASTER TRUST, THE MERGER FUND VL, WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND, JNL/WESTCHESTER CAPITAL EVENT DRIVEN FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AZZARELLO, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND et al v. PERRIGO CO., PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MERGER FUND VL
Represented By: JOHN A. AZZARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JNL/WESTCHESTER CAPITAL EVENT DRIVEN FUND
Represented By: JOHN A. AZZARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCM ALTERNATIVES: EVENT-DRIVEN FUND
Represented By: JOHN A. AZZARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MERGER FUND
Represented By: JOHN A. AZZARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WCM MASTER TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. AZZARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO CO., PLC
Represented By: ALAN S. NAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PAPA
Represented By: MARSHALL R. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY BROWN
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?