UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406 v. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2018cv16335
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/14/19. (jbb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Certification of Service on behalf of INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. Re #11 Answer to Complaint, #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C..(DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. identifying Macquarie Infrastructure Corp as Corporate Parent.. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
January 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Jessica Kastin, Esq. and Justin D. Martin, Esq.: $ 300, receipt number NEW038349 (gl, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica Kastin, Esq. and Justin D. Martin, Esq., etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/7/2019. (gl, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Kastin and Justin D. Martin by INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer L. Del Medico, #2 Certification of Jessica Kastin, #3 Certification of Justin D. Martin, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
December 28, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/11/2019. (mfr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER LYNN DEL MEDICO on behalf of INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (TYKULSKER, DAVID)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (fp, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406. Amendment to #2 Exhibit (to Document), Exhibit A (Amended). (TYKULSKER, DAVID)
November 20, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to Complaint by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Complaint, #2 Exhibit C to Complaint)(TYKULSKER, DAVID)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9186479), filed by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406.(TYKULSKER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406 v. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS, BAYONNE, L.L.C.
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN DEL MEDICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO/CLC LOCAL 4-406
Represented By: DAVID TYKULSKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?