GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC v. SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC et al

Plaintiff: GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC
Defendant: LEONARD R. WATTS, MARY DOES 1-99, FRANKLIN OGELE, PHOENIX REALTY, INC., ABC LLC 1-99, GEORGE B BUCHANAN, JR., MICHAEL JAMES MALONE, PLLC, SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC, XYZ CORP. 1-99, BIG TWINKIE, INC., JOHN DOES 1-99 and RAY WATTS
Case Number: 2:2018cv16408
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION to Continue REMAND HEARING. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Mark Slama re #10 Letter,. (CORRIGAN, DANIEL)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from FRANKLIN OGELE re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #7 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #9 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #8 First MOTION to Continue REMAND HEARING, #6 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (OGELE, FRANKLIN)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC re #8 First MOTION to Continue REMAND HEARING (CORRIGAN, DANIEL)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Continue REMAND HEARING by ABC LLC 1-99, BIG TWINKIE, INC., GEORGE B BUCHANAN, JR., JOHN DOES 1-99, MARY DOES 1-99, MICHAEL JAMES MALONE, PLLC, FRANKLIN OGELE, PHOENIX REALTY, INC., SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC, LEONARD R. WATTS, XYZ CORP. 1-99. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit)(OGELE, FRANKLIN)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC re #4 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D. Corrigan w/ Exhibit)(CORRIGAN, DANIEL)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #4 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(OGELE, FRANKLIN)
December 21, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Amended Notice of Removal send to the clerk's office by attorney Franklin Ogele, must be filed electronically by attorney. Documents must be filed electronically as it is required by the court. Thank You. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (JB, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mark A. Slama by GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC. (SLAMA, MARK)
December 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand , MOTION for Sanctions by GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Declaration Counsel Slama Decl, #3 Exhibit Slama Exh A - NJ Law Div Complaint, #4 Exhibit Slama Exh B - NJ Foreclosure Complaint, #5 Exhibit Slama Exh C - NJ Law Div. AOSs, #6 Exhibit Slama Exh D -NJ Foreclosure AOSs, #7 Exhibit Slama Exh E - Default in Law Div, #8 Exhibit Slama Exh F - Default in Foreclosure, #9 Exhibit Slama Exh G - Rule 11 Friv. Litigation Notice, #10 Declaration Counsel Knowlton Decl, #11 Exhibit Knowlton Exh A - SC Horry Complaint, #12 Exhibit Knowlton Exh B - SC Marion Complaint, #13 Exhibit Knowlton Exh C - SC Horry AOSs, #14 Exhibit Knowlton Exh D - SC Marion AOSs, #15 Exhibit Knowlton Exh E - Receiver Order, #16 Affidavit J. Carter Affidavit, #17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CORRIGAN, DANIEL)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A. SLAMA on behalf of GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC (SLAMA, MARK)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIG TWINKIE, INC., PHOENIX REALTY, INC., SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC identifying No Corporate Parent. (byl)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BIG TWINKIE, INC., FRANKLIN OGELE, SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC, LEONARD R. WATTS, PHOENIX REALTY, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT, HUDSON COUNTY LAW DIVISION, case number HUD-L-003699-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW037997), filed by BIG TWINKIE, INC., FRANKLIN OGELE, SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC, LEONARD R. WATTS, PHOENIX REALTY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(byl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC v. SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD R. WATTS
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY DOES 1-99
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN OGELE
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX REALTY, INC.
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LLC 1-99
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE B BUCHANAN, JR.
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JAMES MALONE, PLLC
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT TERMINAL, LLC
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP. 1-99
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIG TWINKIE, INC.
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-99
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY WATTS
Represented By: FRANKLIN I. OGELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND COAST CAPITAL FUND I, LLC
Represented By: MARK A. SLAMA
Represented By: DANIEL FARRELL CORRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?