Balice et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael Balice, Ronald Ottavianno and RONALD OTTAVIANO
Defendant: AVS Properties, LLC and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv16429
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: Jose L Linares
3 Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by MICHAEL BALICE (dam, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #4 MOTION to Remand (WAGNER, NELSON)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION/PETITION to strike pleading for lack of legal standing to represent defendant for by MICHAEL BALICE. (JB, )
December 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey State Court by MICHAEL BALICE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Jose L. Linares, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/30/18. (ak, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Intervene and Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(WAGNER, NELSON)
November 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Superior Court of Middlesex County, New Jersey, case number C-165-18., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Notice to State Court of Removal), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(WAGNER, NELSON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balice et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVS Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: NELSON DIETRICH WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Balice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ottavianno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD OTTAVIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?