ABELL v. PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC et al
Plaintiff: MS. RESHMA ABELL
Defendant: PAUL CIAVOLELLA, DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN, JOYCE DAVIS, DAVE STACK, RICH KAHR, GLENN REISER, MATT LEHMANN, PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC and PETER MURPHY
Case Number: 2:2018cv16509
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER Granting #27 Letter from Plaintiff Attorney, requesting an adjournment of the current return date for the motion to dismiss. The new return date is 2/19/2019, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/9/2019. (JB, )
January 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAVIER GARCIA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Javier F. Garcia to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9291818.) (MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Javier Garcia, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/4/2019. (JB, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 28 Certification of Javier Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Re #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Cox)(MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
January 3, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Plaintiff Attorney. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
January 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motions set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
December 28, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Anthony Molloy, #3 Certification of Javier Garcia)(MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. JOYCE DAVIS served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. GLENN REISER served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. MATT LEHMANN served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. RICH KAHR served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. DAVE STACK served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. PETER MURPHY served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. PAUL CIAVOLELLA served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY MOLLOY, III on behalf of All Defendants (MOLLOY, ANTHONY)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RESHMA ABELL. PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information modified to reflect information in caption of Complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAUL CIAVOLELLA, JOYCE DAVIS, RICH KAHR, MATT LEHMANN, DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN, PETER MURPHY, PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC, GLENN REISER, DAVE STACK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
November 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to MATT LEHMANN. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to JOYCE DAVIS. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to GLENN REISER. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to GLENN REISER. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to PAUL CIAVOLELLA. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to PETER MURPHY. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to RICH KAHR. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to DAVE STACK, DAVE STACK(IN HIS CAPACITY AS CEO OF PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS). (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by RESHMA ABELL as to PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, JS-44 Civil Action Cover Sheet by RESHMA ABELL. (PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAUL CIAVOLELLA, JOYCE DAVIS, RICH KAHR, MATT LEHMANN, DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN, PETER MURPHY, PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC, GLENN REISER, DAVE STACK, DAVE STACK(IN HIS CAPACITY AS CEO OF PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9199587) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RESHMA ABELL.(PISANO-MCNALLY, MILENA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABELL v. PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL CIAVOLELLA
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS MCLOUGHLIN
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOYCE DAVIS
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE STACK
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICH KAHR
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN REISER
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT LEHMANN
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER MURPHY
Represented By: ANTHONY MOLLOY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS. RESHMA ABELL
Represented By: MILENA GRAZIELLA PISANO-MCNALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?