KENNEDY v. TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KENNEDY
Defendant: TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-25 and ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv16550
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/25/2019. (kd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (WILLIAMSON, MITCHELL)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (WILLIAMSON, MITCHELL)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC.(WILLIAMSON, MITCHELL)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The time of Defendants Trident Asset Management, LLC and Orion Portfolio Services, LLC to appear, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended through and including 1/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/3/2019. (dam, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Issued Stipulation between the parties extending time to January 21, 2019 to file answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. (WILLIAMSON, MITCHELL)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL L WILLIAMSON on behalf of ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC (WILLIAMSON, MITCHELL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL KENNEDY. TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (JONES, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ys, )
November 29, 2018 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by MICHAEL KENNEDY as to ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JONES, JOSEPH)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-25, ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9202972) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL KENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JONES, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: MITCHELL L WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: MITCHELL L WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KENNEDY
Represented By: JOSEPH K. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?