BARONE v. PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Barone
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC. and JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2018cv16569
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct the ComplaintFirst MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint, First MOTION to Remand to State Court by JOSEPH BARONE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick J. Whalen, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law ISO of Motion to Amend and Remand (with Exhibit), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RUBIN, ALIX)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding #13 Letter from David B. Lichtenberg. These contentions will all be considered in relation to any granted version of the complaint.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/17/2019. (JB, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from David B. Lichtenberg. (LICHTENBERG, DAVID)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER Granting #11 Letter from Alix Rubin, requesting stay on defendant's motion to dismiss in part, pending the Courts' decision on our motion to amend the Complaint and remand.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/15/2019. (JB, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Alix Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service)(RUBIN, ALIX)
December 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in Part. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in Part . (WHALEN, PATRICK)
December 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in Part. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint in Part by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC.. Responses due by 1/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LICHTENBERG, DAVID)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH BARONE. PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (RUBIN, ALIX)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH BARONE. PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (RUBIN, ALIX)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ALIX R. RUBIN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RUBIN, ALIX)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC. (CALDWELL, AMANDA)
December 3, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/20/2018. (dam, )
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action modified from 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) to 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations. Party Information modified to reflect information in caption of state court complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. WHALEN on behalf of JOSEPH BARONE (WHALEN, PATRICK)
November 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (LICHTENBERG, DAVID)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC. identifying PSE Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LICHTENBERG, DAVID)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey, County of Essex, case number ESX-L-7606-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9203535), filed by PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(LICHTENBERG, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARONE v. PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Barone
Represented By: PATRICK J. WHALEN
Represented By: ALIX R. RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID B. LICHTENBERG
Represented By: AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: DAVID B. LICHTENBERG
Represented By: AMANDA KIRSTEN CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?