BREWSTER MARINE, LLC et al
Petitioner: PETER BREWSTER and BREWSTER MARINE, LLC
Claimant: LUKE LUCAS
Case Number: 2:2018cv16685
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (dam, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Restraining Suits, Approving Petitioners' Security, Directing Issue of Notice and the Filing of Claims. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/9/2019. (dam, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Joseph R. Federici to Hon. Esther Salas re: Restraining Order. (FEDERICI, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9206982), filed by BREWSTER MARINE, LLC, PETER BREWSTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Vessel Appraisal, #2 Exhibit B Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(FEDERICI, JOSEPH) Modified on 12/3/2018 (ti, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREWSTER MARINE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PETER BREWSTER
Represented By: JOSEPH ROBERT FEDERICI, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BREWSTER MARINE, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH ROBERT FEDERICI, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: LUKE LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?