SARWAR et al v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TOMMIE SHERRILL, ANTHONY FIORINO, THOMAS SCHENK, DAN BISHOP, WAGNER MACIEL, NASIMA SARWAR, VARTAN NAZARIAN, MENACHEM LANGER, LEONARD EARL JONES, PAT MOORE, GERALD MOORE, PABLO LOPEZ, GEORGE WILLIAMS, RICHARD BAKER, BRIAN BERGE, JOHNNY BOGGS, MARY HARMON, GARRY NORRIS, STEVIE MASON, RANDY WITHERS, DAVID STEFANIK, CHARLES ROBINSON, MAURICE HARRELL, JR.,, MD ISLAM, EDWARD SMITH, JAMES GRAVES, JANA JOHNSON, RASHONDA WHEELER, JEFFREY MATTSON, LARRY DAY and MATTHEW KLEIN
Defendant: BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS and BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv16750
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (ANDREACCHI, STEVEN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of G. Palacios, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANDREACCHI, STEVEN)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO APPEAR, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE MOVE PURSUANT TO FRCP 6(b); It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant, BMW of North America, that the time within which said Defendant may Answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to the Complaint, be and is hereby further extended to and including January 29, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 01/10/2019. (sms)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Further Extension of Time to Appear, Answer or Otherwise Move Pursuant to FRCP 6(b) by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (ANDREACCHI, STEVEN)
January 4, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/18/2019. (sms)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to BMW of North America, LLC. Attorney STEVEN AUGUSTINE ANDREACCHI for BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC added. (ANDREACCHI, STEVEN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAURICE HARRELL, JR.,, RASHONDA WHEELER, BRIAN BERGE, LEONARD EARL JONES, RICHARD BAKER, GERALD MOORE, DAN BISHOP. BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (BALILE, SOFIA)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANA JOHNSON, MAURICE HARRELL, JR.,, PABLO LOPEZ, MD ISLAM, JOHNNY BOGGS, JAMES GRAVES, RASHONDA WHEELER, ANTHONY FIORINO, BRIAN BERGE, LEONARD EARL JONES, RICHARD BAKER, WAGNER MACIEL, STEVIE MASON, GERALD MOORE, DAN BISHOP, MATTHEW KLEIN, LARRY DAY, MENACHEM LANGER, JEFFREY MATTSON, MARY HARMON. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (BALILE, SOFIA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
December 3, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9211090) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NASIMA SARWAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BALILE, SOFIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SARWAR et al v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMIE SHERRILL
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY FIORINO
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS SCHENK
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN BISHOP
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAGNER MACIEL
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASIMA SARWAR
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VARTAN NAZARIAN
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENACHEM LANGER
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD EARL JONES
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAT MOORE
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD MOORE
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO LOPEZ
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE WILLIAMS
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BAKER
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BERGE
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY BOGGS
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HARMON
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY NORRIS
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVIE MASON
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY WITHERS
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID STEFANIK
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES ROBINSON
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE HARRELL, JR.,
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD ISLAM
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD SMITH
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GRAVES
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANA JOHNSON
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHONDA WHEELER
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY MATTSON
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY DAY
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW KLEIN
Represented By: SOFIA BALILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN AUGUSTINE ANDREACCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?