BAPTISTE v. ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES
Petitioner: OSCAR BAPTISTE
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES
Case Number: 2:2018cv16826
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 USMS 285 FORM RETURNED. (as, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. Three USM285 forms mailed. (nic, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. The Clerk is ordered to file the complaint, and provide the Plaintiff with USM285 Forms for each defendant to complete and return. The Clerk shall issue a summons after all completed USM285 Forms are returned, and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendant(s) as directed by the Plaintiff.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/7/2018. (dam, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus Received. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Status Update, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Application IFP, #4 Motion to Leave to Proceed, #5 Exhibit, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Envelope)(as, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAPTISTE v. ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OSCAR BAPTISTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?