ISMAIL et al v. MPOWER LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr. MOHAMMAD JAFAR ISMAIL, PORTOPP NJ ONE LLC, Mrs. LUBNA ISMAIL, MOHAMMAD ISMAIL and PORTOPP NJ ONE, LLC
Defendant: Mr. SAMEERULLAH SHERIFF, HALAL FOOD STANDARDS ALLIANCE OF AMERICA, MOHAMMAD F HAQQANI, MPOWER VENTURES LLC, BRAINIAC ASSETS, INC., Mr. SYED PASHA, SAMEERULLAH M. SHERIFF and MPOWER LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv17054
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M. DARNALL on behalf of BRAINIAC ASSETS, INC., MOHAMMAD F HAQQANI, MPOWER LLC, SYED PASHA, SAMEERULLAH M. SHERIFF (DARNALL, RICHARD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #6 Order to Show Cause,, by LUBNA ISMAIL, MOHAMMAD ISMAIL, PORTOPP NJ ONE, LLC. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by LUBNA ISMAIL, MOHAMMAD ISMAIL, PORTOPP NJ ONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Declaration)(CHONG, MICHAEL)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Plaintiff will show cause why the complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs must electronically file their response with the Courtby 2/6/2019. The defendants must electronically file their response with theCourt by 2/13/2019. The parties will refrain from moving for any dispositive relief in this action while the determination of this Order to Show Cause is pending. etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/22/2019. (dam, )
January 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice Of Appearance document #5 submitted by Harris Chernow on 1/17/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ys, ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRIS JAY CHERNOW on behalf of BRAINIAC ASSETS, INC., MOHAMMAD F HAQQANI, MPOWER LLC, SYED PASHA, SAMEERULLAH M. SHERIFF (CHERNOW, HARRIS)
January 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond by MPOWER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification In Support of Motion, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit R.7.1 Disclosure)(CINTI, JOHN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PORTOPP NJ ONE, LLC. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
December 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information modified to reflect information in caption of complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
December 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRAINIAC ASSETS, INC., HALAL FOOD STANDARDS ALLIANCE OF AMERICA, MOHAMMAD F HAQQANI, MPOWER LLC, SYED PASHA, SAMEERULLAH M. SHERIFF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
December 11, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9230390) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PORTOPP NJ ONE LLC, LUBNA ISMAIL, MOHAMMAD JAFAR ISMAIL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civ. Cover Sheet)(CHONG, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISMAIL et al v. MPOWER LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. SAMEERULLAH SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALAL FOOD STANDARDS ALLIANCE OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOHAMMAD F HAQQANI
Represented By: HARRIS JAY CHERNOW
Represented By: RICHARD M. DARNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPOWER VENTURES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAINIAC ASSETS, INC.
Represented By: HARRIS JAY CHERNOW
Represented By: RICHARD M. DARNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. SYED PASHA
Represented By: HARRIS JAY CHERNOW
Represented By: RICHARD M. DARNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMEERULLAH M. SHERIFF
Represented By: HARRIS JAY CHERNOW
Represented By: RICHARD M. DARNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPOWER LLC
Represented By: JOHN M. CINTI
Represented By: HARRIS JAY CHERNOW
Represented By: RICHARD M. DARNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. MOHAMMAD JAFAR ISMAIL
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CHONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTOPP NJ ONE LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CHONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. LUBNA ISMAIL
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CHONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD ISMAIL
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CHONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTOPP NJ ONE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL K. CHONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?