YUHASZ v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS) et al
Plaintiff: JOANNE N. YUHASZ
Defendant: TATYANA MARX, MD, NEUROLOGY SPECIALISTS OF MORRIS COUNTY, LLC, JOHN KIRCHNER, MARJORIE P. FORGANG, PRIME REHABILITATION SERVICES, DANA BOYLE, WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC. and CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS)
Case Number: 2:2018cv17110
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by DANA BOYLE, PRIME REHABILITATION SERVICES. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Shane P. Simon, Esq., #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(SIMON, SHANE)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Roy Alan Cohen, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, ROY)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES; It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiff Joanne N. Yuhasz ("Plaintiff"), and defendant Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services ("CMS"), that all claims that were or could have been brought in the above-captioned action by Plaintiff against CMS, are dismissed with prejudice and without costs, attorneys' fees, expenses, or disbursements to any party. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 01/30/2019. (sms)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to CMS by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEYLER, DANIEL)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; Defendant Prime Rehabilitation Services' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby extended until January 31, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 01/13/2019. (sms)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by PRIME REHABILITATION SERVICES. (SIMON, SHANE)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; and the Defendant Wellcare Health Plans' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended until January 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/27/2018. (sms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office advising of agreed dismissal of CMS and requesting 30 day extension due to lapse in government funding. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEYLER, DANIEL)
December 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 26, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/31/2018. (sms)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, ROY)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wellcare Health Plans.. (COHEN, ROY)
December 20, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC. has been DENIED. (Clerk's Extension can not be granted past the 14 days.) (sms)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wellcare Health Plans. Attorney ROY ALAN COHEN for WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC. added. (COHEN, ROY)
December 13, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS) has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/02/2019. (sms)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendant Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS).. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MEYLER, DANIEL)
December 12, 2018 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS) from Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County, case number MRS-L-842-18., filed by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint & Summons), #2 Exhibit B (Letter to State Court), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(MEYLER, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUHASZ v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATYANA MARX, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEUROLOGY SPECIALISTS OF MORRIS COUNTY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KIRCHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARJORIE P. FORGANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME REHABILITATION SERVICES
Represented By: SHANE P. SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA BOYLE
Represented By: SHANE P. SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: ROY ALAN COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS)
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM MEYLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE N. YUHASZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?