CATOGGIO v. SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25 et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN CATOGGIO
Defendant: ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC, ABC CORP. 1-10, SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25, JOHN DOES 1-10 and JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25
Case Number: 2:2018cv17120
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC, JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25 re #8 MOTION to Remand Joint Letter Sur-Reply Brief (ZUROFSKY, BENNET)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEVEN CATOGGIO re #8 MOTION to Remand (SLAWINSKI, JOSEPH)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(DOUGLAS, JEFFREY)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand (DOUGLAS, JEFFREY)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION/PETITION for Oral Argument for by JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25. (ZUROFSKY, BENNET)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court having reviewed the letters submitted by the parties, (ECF Nos. 11, 12), and for reasons of good Court administration, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 5), is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may be refiled if appropriate after the Court determines Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, (ECF No. 8). So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 01/08/2019. (lr, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SALVADOR PEDRO SIMAO on behalf of ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC (SIMAO, SALVADOR)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Jeffrey Douglas on behalf of Alliance Industries, LLC re #11 Letter. (DOUGLAS, JEFFREY)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff. (SLAWINSKI, JOSEPH)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25 re #5 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce to Dismiss Complaint, #8 MOTION to Remand (ZUROFSKY, BENNET)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2019 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/3/19. (nm, )
December 31, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by STEVEN CATOGGIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(SLAWINSKI, JOSEPH)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
December 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that The Motion to Quash/Compel docket entry #5 has been modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect the correct title as Motion to Dismiss. This is for informational purposes and no further action is needed. (sms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jeffrey G. Douglas by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(DOUGLAS, JEFFREY)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (DOUGLAS, JEFFREY) Modified on 12/28/2018 (sms).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DOUGLAS, JEFFREY) Modified on 12/28/2018 (sms).
December 23, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint of STEVEN CATOGGIO, Plaintiff, by JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25.(ZUROFSKY, BENNET)
December 13, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/28/2018. (sms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (DOUGLAS, JEFFREY)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ELLIOT D. BUCKMAN on behalf of ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC (BUCKMAN, ELLIOT)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC from Superior Court, Law Division: Passaic County, case number PAS-L-2686-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9224809), filed by JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25, ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Clerk's Note: Document initially filed in 2:17-cv-11674-JLL-JAD) (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Termination Letter, #3 Restated Agreement and Declaration of Trust, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certification of Compliance)(jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CATOGGIO v. SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN CATOGGIO
Represented By: JOSEPH P. SLAWINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: ELLIOT D. BUCKMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY DOUGLAS
Represented By: SALVADOR PEDRO SIMAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEET METAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LOCAL UNION 25
Represented By: BENNET DANN ZUROFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING COMMITTEE OF THE SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION 25
Represented By: BENNET DANN ZUROFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?