CAYAX et al v. KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LUZ A. VILLADA-ECHEVERRI and ERVIN R. CAYAX
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10 and KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv17135
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/20/2018. (seb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.. (FAZIO, PETER)
December 13, 2018 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.. (FAZIO, PETER)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF MORRIS COUNTY, case number MRS L 1973 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9237945), filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(FAZIO, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAYAX et al v. KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ A. VILLADA-ECHEVERRI
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERVIN R. CAYAX
Represented By: ROBERT D. KOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: PETER JOSEPH FAZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?