CRUZ-ROMERO v. AHRENDT
Petitioner: RICARDO ANTONIO CRUZ-ROMERO
Respondent: ACTING AG MATTHEW WHITAKER, STEVEN AHRENDT, RONALD D VITIELLO, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, ANTHONY CURETON, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and ANGEL M. MELENDEZ
Case Number: 2:2018cv17177
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting an extension of time to respond. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 2/1/19. (ro, )
February 1, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by STEVEN AHRENDT has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/15/19. (ro, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request For New Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for STEVEN AHRENDT added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICARDO ANTONIO CRUZ-ROMERO., etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/18/2018. (JB, )
December 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfr)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER; dismissing without prejudice Respondents U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen, Thomas Homan, Ronald D. Vitiello, Angel M. Melendez, and Anthony Cureton; the Clerk of the Court shall add "Steven Ahrendt, Warden of Bergen County Jail" as a Respondent; the Clerk shall forward a copy of the Petition (at ECF No. 1) and this Memorandum Order to the Civil Division Chief of the United States Attorneys Office; within forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Memorandum Order, Respondent shall electronically file an answer to the Petition; Petitioner may file and serve a reply within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed; within seven (7) days of Petitioners release, by parole or otherwise, as well as any change in the basis for Petitioners immigration detention, Respondent shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk of the Court; etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/18/2018. (sms)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICARDO ANTONIO CRUZ-ROMERO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Tejinder Bains, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PAWAR, VIKRANT) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/20/2018) (mfr).
December 14, 2018 Judge John Michael Vazquez added. (eu, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-11179. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (jca)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER OF VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, Newark Division, and that the seven-day waiting period in Local Civil Rule 83.1 is waived. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/12/2018) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Anthony Cureton, Thomas Homan, Angel M. Melendez, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S Department of Homeland Security, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. (Byars, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Anthony Cureton, Thomas Homan, Angel M. Melendez, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, U.S Department of Homeland Security, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. (Byars, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 3, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 3, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Tejinder Singh Bains. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S Department of Homeland Security, Matthew Whitaker, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Thomas Homan, Ronald D. Vitiello, Angel M. Melendez, Anthony Cureton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (pne)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Tejinder Singh Bains. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Diane McConnell. The party was not listed on the pleading caption; the party was added to the case in error. (pne)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Ricardo Antonio Cruz-Romero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bains, Tejinder) Modified on 12/3/2018 (pne).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bains, Tejinder) Modified on 12/3/2018 (pne).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15985608)Document filed by Ricardo Antonio Cruz-Romero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bains, Tejinder)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUZ-ROMERO v. AHRENDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ACTING AG MATTHEW WHITAKER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN AHRENDT
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANTHONY CURETON
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANGEL M. MELENDEZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICARDO ANTONIO CRUZ-ROMERO
Represented By: Tejinder Singh Bains
Represented By: VIKRANT PAWAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?