GOLIA et al v. JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: BRIEANA GOLIA and DAVID GOLIA
Defendant: JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, JANE ROE, ROBERT TOMARO, DOE PHYSICIAN GROUPP. PA 1-15 or DOE PHYSICIAN GROUP. PC 1-15 or DOE MANAGED CARE COMPANY 1-15, ABC HOSPITAL, ELENA GORE, KATHLEEN S WALSH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER MEDICAL STAFF, ALEXANDRA CHRISTIE, ROBIN ANDERSEN, MARY DOE, M.D., ALEXANDRA GIGLIO, JOHN ROE, M.D., HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH and JOHN DOES
Case Number: 2:2018cv17475
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Essex County Veterans Courthouse50 West Market StreetNewark, NJ 07102 State No: ESX-L-07674-18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (gl, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT ORDER TO REMAND TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, LAW DIVISION, ESSEX COUNTY. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/3/2019. (gl, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Pretrial Order Consent Order to Remand to Superior Court by ROBERT TOMARO. (DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)
December 27, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer to Complaint, exhibit to document number 1 by Donald Grasso, Esq. on 12/21/18 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (th, )
December 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
December 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROBERT TOMARO from Superior Court of New Jersey Essex County, case number L-7674-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9260955), filed by ROBERT TOMARO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOLIA et al v. JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT TOMARO
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE PHYSICIAN GROUPP. PA 1-15 or DOE PHYSICIAN GROUP. PC 1-15 or DOE MANAGED CARE COMPANY 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELENA GORE
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN S WALSH
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER MEDICAL STAFF
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA CHRISTIE
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN ANDERSEN
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY DOE, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA GIGLIO
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROE, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIEANA GOLIA
Represented By: HARRIS SCOTT FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID GOLIA
Represented By: HARRIS SCOTT FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?