LINDSAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: ANTHONY LINDSAY
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2018cv17581
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case, without filing the motion; Petitioner is informed that administrative termination is not a dismissal for purposes of the statute of limitations, and that if the case is reopened, it is not subject to the statute of limitations time bar if it was originally filed timely; the Clerk of the Court shall forward Petitioner a blank section 2255 form AO243 (modified): DNJ-Habeas-004 (Rev. 01-2014); if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court, in a writing addressed to the Clerk of the Court, Martin Luther King Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, NJ 07101, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order; Petitioners writing shall include a complete, signed 2255 motion on the appropriate form; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Petitioner by regular U.S. mail; etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 01/29/2019. (sms)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN GAY terminated. Attorney R. JOSEPH GRIBKO for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (GRIBKO, R.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 06-8132 (MCA), filed by ANTHONY LINDSAY. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Envelope)(lag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN GAY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH GRIBKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHONY LINDSAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?