MENDY v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. et al

Plaintiff: EDWARD B. MENDY
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 10, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. and XYZ NSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00135
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, DOES 1 THROUGH 10, HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., XYZ NSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 USMS 285 FORM RETURNED. (as, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (gl, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Granting #1 APPLICATION to Proceed without the Prepayment of Fees; the Clerk is ordered to file the complaint, and provide the Plaintiff(s) with USM285 Forms for each defendant to complete and return; the Clerk shall issue a summons after all completed USM285 Forms are returned, and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendant(s) as directed by the Plaintiff(s). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/14/2019. (gl, )(n/m)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, DOES 1 THROUGH 10, HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., XYZ NSURANCE COMPANY, filed by EDWARD B. MENDY. (IFP Granted, See D.E. #1 for Documents)(gl, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDY v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ NSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD B. MENDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?