RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. v. KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.
Defendant: KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION and MITESH KALTHIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00177
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Steven C Mannion
1 Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.. MITESH KALTHIA served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.. KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (BRYAN, CATHERINE)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MITESH KALTHIA, KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
January 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
January 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MITESH KALTHIA, KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9287176), filed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC. v. KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALTHIA CONSTRUCTION AND MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITESH KALTHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?