SMITH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: MAE SMITH
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, NEWARK COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTERS, INC., ABC CORPS. 1-10, SHARON JOHNSON, M.D, JOHN DOES, ABC CORPS and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00242
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 4/9/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/11/2019. (spc, )
February 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting the Government until 2/8/2019 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 2/5/2019. (sm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from AUSA Ben Kuruvilla re: extension of time to respond to complaint. (KURUVILLA, BEN)
January 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWARK COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTERS, INC., SHARON JOHNSON, M.D from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-5304-18., filed by NEWARK COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTERS, INC., SHARON JOHNSON, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Meredith Torres and exhibit 1), #3 Exhibit C (Certification of Scope of Employment), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWARK COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: BEN KURUVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARON JOHNSON, M.D
Represented By: BEN KURUVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BEN KURUVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAE SMITH
Represented By: HOWARD Z. MYEROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?