JACKSON HEWITT INC. v. M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED et al

Plaintiff: JACKSON HEWITT INC.
Defendant: CRAIG A. JACOBSON, THERESA M. JACOBSON and M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2019cv00307
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Steven C Mannion
1 Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L. Burnett on 02/22/2019. (mls)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 Application for Refund of Fees from James S. Coons to the Clerk of the Court (finance notified).. (Attachments: #1 Receipt No. 1, #2 Receipt No. 2)(COONS, JAMES)
February 19, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED, CRAIG A. JACOBSON, THERESA M. JACOBSON for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against M&I Tax and Accounting Incorporated, Craig A. Jacobson and Thersa A. Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COONS, JAMES)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE #17 by CRAIG A. JACOBSON. (ld, )
January 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JONATHAN P. LABUKAS, ESQ. and SCOTT MCINTOSH, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause; that Jackson Hewitt's application for preliminary injunctive relief against Defendants be and hereby is GRANTED; that Defendants, their employees, agents, independent contractors, and all those who act in concert or participation with them are immediately and preliminarily enjoined from directly or indirectly preparing or electronically filing individual income tax returns, teaching taxcourses, offering Financial Products (defined as refund anticipation loans, accelerated check refunds, assisted direct deposits, and any other similar or substitute products offered by Jackson Hewitt), or owning, engaging in, operating, managing, purchasing, investing in (except to purchase stock in a publicly traded company listed on a national stock exchange), franchising,lending money to, leasing or subleasing to, or agreeing to sell or selling all or a majority of the assets of their former franchise businesses to any Competing Tax Business, within their former Territories (as that term is defined in the Franchise Agreements), or within an area ten (10) miles outside the boundaries of the Territories for the later of two years from the date of this Order or when Defendants demonstrate compliance with this Order; etc.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/24/2019. (ld, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan P. Labukas, Esq. and Scott McIntosh, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (COONS, JAMES)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from James S. Coons to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(COONS, JAMES)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/23/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella.) (cds)
January 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW038481 for SCOTT MCINTOSH, ESQ. (ld, )
January 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW038480 for JONATHAN P.LABUKAS, ESQ. (ld, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from James S. Coons to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S.D.J. re #7 Order to Show Cause,, #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraints against Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Short in Further Support of Plaintiff's Application for an Order to Show Cause)(COONS, JAMES)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan P. Labukas, Esq. and Scott McIntosh, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 1/18/2019. (ld, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACKSON HEWITT INC.. THERESA M. JACOBSON served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (COONS, JAMES)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACKSON HEWITT INC.. CRAIG A. JACOBSON served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (COONS, JAMES)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACKSON HEWITT INC.. M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (COONS, JAMES)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JACKSON HEWITT INC. re #7 Order to Show Cause,, (COONS, JAMES)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS; Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2019 11:30 AM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. at the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, Martin Luther King Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, New Jersey. Defendants shall show cause why an Order should not be entered. Defendants shall serve and file any answering affidavits or memoranda in response to Jackson Hewitt's application on or before Mon., Jan. 21, 2019 at 4pm.; and Jackson Hewitt shall serve and file any reply papers on or Tues., Jan. 22, 2019 at 4pm. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/16/2019. (ld, )
January 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Labukas, Esq. and Scott McIntosh, Esq., #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraints against Defendants. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Temporary Restraints against Defendants by JACKSON HEWITT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Declaration of Brandon Short in Support, #3 Declaration of Meghan Harrison in Support, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Certificate of Service)(COONS, JAMES)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Labukas, Esq. and Scott McIntosh, Esq. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James S. Coons, #2 Certification Jonathan P. Labukas, Esq., #3 Certification Scott McIntosh, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COONS, JAMES)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRAIG A. JACOBSON, THERESA M. JACOBSON, M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT) (ld, )
January 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JACKSON HEWITT INC. identifying JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC. as Corporate Parent.. (COONS, JAMES)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9295394), filed by JACKSON HEWITT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(COONS, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON HEWITT INC. v. M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG A. JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA M. JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&I TAX AND ACCOUNTING INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON HEWITT INC.
Represented By: JAMES SIMON COONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?