DUBON v. SPAIN INN, INC. et al

Plaintiff: OSCAR DUBON
Defendant: SPAIN INN, INC., LUIS RODRIGUEZ and JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv00452
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: James B Clark
1 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by OSCAR DUBON.(GLENN, ANDREW)
February 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCORDO, ANTHONY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOSE RODRIGUEZ, LUIS RODRIGUEZ, SPAIN INN, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSE RODRIGUEZ, LUIS RODRIGUEZ, SPAIN INN, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9303974) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OSCAR DUBON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUBON v. SPAIN INN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPAIN INN, INC.
Represented By: ANTHONY SCORDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ANTHONY SCORDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ANTHONY SCORDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSCAR DUBON
Represented By: ANDREW I. GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?