C.S. v. HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC et al
Plaintiff: C.S.
Defendant: BETTY McCABE, JOHN DOE 2 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown), JOE DOE 1 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown), Yan Moshe, and JOHN DOES 4-14 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown), HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JOHN DOE 3 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown), JOHN DOE 3, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOES 4-14 and JOHN DOE 1
Petitioner: C.S. Individually and as a Class Representatives
Case Number: 2:2019cv00964
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DAVID CELENTANO on behalf of HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, BETTY MCCABE, YAN MOSHE (CELENTANO, MICHAEL)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/18/19. (LM, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (WILLIAMS, RICHARD)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, BETTY MCCABE, YAN MOSHE.(WILLIAMS, RICHARD)
January 23, 2019 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC from NJ Superior Court Bergen County, case number BER-L-9289-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9328120), filed by HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(WILLIAMS, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.S. v. HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY McCABE
Represented By: RICHARD J. WILLIAMS, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID CELENTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE DOE 1 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Moshe
Represented By: RICHARD J. WILLIAMS, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID CELENTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and JOHN DOES 4-14 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHPLUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Represented By: RICHARD J. WILLIAMS, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID CELENTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3 (said name being fictitious as currently unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 4-14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: C.S. Individually and as a Class Representatives
Represented By: MICHAEL J. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.S.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?