DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. AKRA HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: MANTA R PATEL, KALPESH PATEL, ARKA HOSPITALITY, LLC, RAKESH N PATEL and MAMTA R. PATEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv01462
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SARI BLAIR PLACONA on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (PLACONA, SARI)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARKA HOSPITALITY, LLC, KALPESH PATEL, MAMTA R. PATEL, RAKESH N PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
January 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARKA HOSPITALITY, LLC, KALPESH PATEL, MANTA R PATEL, RAKESH N PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9345320), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) Modified on 1/29/2019 (jr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. AKRA HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: SARI BLAIR PLACONA
Represented By: BRIA S. BEAUFORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANTA R PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALPESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARKA HOSPITALITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAKESH N PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAMTA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?