DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: HAROLD WALLS, KARL WALLS and CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01484
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND re #7 Defendants' Letter. The time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/8/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/2019. (dam, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN on behalf of All Defendants (EINHORN, KATHLEEN)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE BLUESTONE on behalf of CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Lawrence Bluestone, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. KARL WALLS served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
January 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
January 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9345675), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: BRIA S. BEAUFORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD WALLS
Represented By: KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN
Represented By: LAWRENCE BLUESTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL WALLS
Represented By: KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN
Represented By: LAWRENCE BLUESTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN
Represented By: LAWRENCE BLUESTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?