DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC v. HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC et al

Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC
Defendant: RITA PATEL, HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC, RAKESH PATEL and RITABEN PATEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv04854
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER-ORDER ORIGINAL FILED WITH THE CLERK OF COURT: Plaintiff is hereby directed to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within twenty (20) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on 4/24/2019. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/4/2019. (dam, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. RITA PATEL served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. RAKESH PATEL served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
February 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC, RAKESH PATEL, RITA PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC (KRUG, KELLY)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC, RAKESH PATEL, RITA PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9388728), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC v. HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANUOMSAI INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAKESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITABEN PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: BRIA S. BEAUFORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?