CHOI v. IMMUNOMEDICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHONGHO CHOI and Franck Alexandre Fiebig
Defendant: USAMA MALIK, IMMUNOMEDICS, INC., MICHAEL R. GARONE and MICHAEL PEHL
Case Number: 2:2019cv05151
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff William Blanchette for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel Notice of Withdrawal (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff, Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Bernstein Liebhard (proposed Lead Counsel); Law Offices of Jan Meyer & Associates, P.C. (proposed Liaison Counsel)., #4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff William Blanchette for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LISA J. RODRIGUEZ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff, Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Bernstein Liebhard (proposed Lead Counsel); Law Offices of Jan Meyer & Associates, P.C. (proposed Liaison Counsel). by Franck Alexandre Fiebig. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F)(ELEM, RICHARD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff William Blanchette for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of L. Rodriguez, #2 Brief Memo of Law in Supp of W. Blanchette Motion for COnsol. Appt. of as Lead Plaintiff, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MICHAEL R. GARONE, IMMUNOMEDICS, INC., USAMA MALIK, MICHAEL PEHL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
February 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by CHONGHO CHOI as to MICHAEL R. GARONE, IMMUNOMEDICS, INC., USAMA MALIK, MICHAEL PEHL. (LINDENFELD, JONATHAN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. GARONE, IMMUNOMEDICS, INC., USAMA MALIK, MICHAEL PEHL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9399291) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHONGHO CHOI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LINDENFELD, JONATHAN) Modified on 2/8/2019 (jr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHOI v. IMMUNOMEDICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHONGHO CHOI
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franck Alexandre Fiebig
Represented By: RICHARD LEVI ELEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAMA MALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMMUNOMEDICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. GARONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PEHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?