MEO v. APPLE, INC.

Plaintiff: JULIA IRELAND MEO
Defendant: APPLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05619
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JULIA IRELAND MEO. APPLE, INC. waiver sent on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (DUFFEY, MARTIN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN K. GERBER on behalf of JULIA IRELAND MEO (GERBER, STEVEN)
February 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APPLE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
February 14, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9413375) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JULIA IRELAND MEO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DUFFEY, MARTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEO v. APPLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA IRELAND MEO
Represented By: MARTIN P. DUFFEY
Represented By: STEVEN K. GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?