LEE v. LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Plaintiff: JOLIE BATTISTA and RODNEY LEE
Defendant: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05770
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Defendant Lakeview Loan Serving, LLC, and Plaintiff Jolie Battista, and Non-Party Rodney Lee (collectively, the Parties") hereby submit this Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice for the above-captioned action; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/26/2019. (sms)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure; etc. Filed by Rodney Lee. (sms)
March 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Stephen Steinlight, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
February 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 03/07/2019. (sms)
February 15, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC from NJ Superior Court Middlesex County, case number MID-DC-000452-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9418612), filed by LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOLIE BATTISTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN STEINLIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?