INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO v. EFTIS GROUP, INC.
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO AND HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL 32 FUNDS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO and HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL 32 FUNDS
Respondent: EFTIS GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05914
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Letter requesting the withdrawal and dismissal of any and all claims currently pending against Defendant EFTIS GROUP, INC. without prejudice. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/2/2019. (dam, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Nicholas P. Milewski. (SCHIRO, LEONARD)
February 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information modified to reflect information in caption of PETITION. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam, )
February 19, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9422006.), filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO AND HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL 32 FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Statement Disclosure Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment)(SCHIRO, LEONARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO v. EFTIS GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EFTIS GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO AND HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL 32 FUNDS
Represented By: LEONARD C. SCHIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL UNION NO. 32, AFL-CIO
Represented By: LEONARD C. SCHIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HEAT & FROST INSULATORS AND ALLIED WORKERS LOCAL 32 FUNDS
Represented By: LEONARD C. SCHIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?