7-ELEVEN, INC. v. MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.,
Defendant: GRACE MAZZOCCHI and MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06153
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 7-ELEVEN, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dennis R. Callahan, #3 Declaration of Christian C. Burden, #4 Certification in Good Standing)(HANSELL, AMY)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC, GRACE MAZZOCCHI. MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; GRACE MAZZOCCHI waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (COLLINS, PATRICK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Counterclaim,, Complaint, by 7-ELEVEN, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(CALLAHAN, DENNIS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRACE MAZZOCCHI, MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7-ELEVEN, INC., identifying SEJ ASSET MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT CO., INC. as Corporate Parent.. (CALLAHAN, DENNIS)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC, GRACE MAZZOCCHI All Defendants, COMPLAINT against MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC, GRACE MAZZOCCHI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9429312), filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALLAHAN, DENNIS) Modified on 2/20/2019 (sm, ). Modified on 2/20/2019 (th).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7-ELEVEN, INC. v. MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE MAZZOCCHI
Represented By: PATRICK T. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZZOCCHI MORTARUOLO, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK T. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.,
Represented By: AMY L. HANSELL
Represented By: DENNIS R. CALLAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?