ABERDEEN CANADA FUNDS-GLOBAL EQUITY FUND et al v. PERRIGO COMPANY PLC et al
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds, Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund, Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund, Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II, Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund, Hydro One Pension Plan, Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, National Pension Service, Aberdeen Monceau, Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund, Devon County Council, Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund, Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV, Staffordshire Pension Fund, Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund, Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan, State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board, London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund, Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds, Permodalan Nasional Berhard, LF Greenmount Fund, Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, I3 Global Equity Fund, Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio, City and County of Swansea Pension Fund, Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund, Aurion International Daily Equity Fund, Falkirk Council Pension Fund, MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme and Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC
Defendant: JUDY L. BROWN, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC and JOSEPH C PAPA
Case Number: 2:2019cv06560
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Discovery Confidentiality Order; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/30/2019. (sms)
April 25, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Alan S. Naar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(NAAR, ALAN)
April 8, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Matthew L. Mustokoff, Esq. and Stephanie M. Grey, Esq. $ 300, receipt number NEW039255. (sms)
April 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN L. HARDIMAN and MICHAEL P. DEVLIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms)
April 4, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael P. Devlin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
April 4, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John L. Hardiman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
April 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER on behalf of Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds, Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC, Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Monceau, Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II, Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund, Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aurion International Daily Equity Fund, City and County of Swansea Pension Fund, Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund, Devon County Council, Falkirk Council Pension Fund, Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio, Hydro One Pension Plan, I3 Global Equity Fund, Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV, LF Greenmount Fund, London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund, MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme, National Pension Service, Permodalan Nasional Berhard, Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan, Staffordshire Pension Fund, State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board (NEWCOMER, MICHELLE)
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE on behalf of Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds, Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC, Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Monceau, Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II, Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund, Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aurion International Daily Equity Fund, City and County of Swansea Pension Fund, Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund, Devon County Council, Falkirk Council Pension Fund, Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio, Hydro One Pension Plan, I3 Global Equity Fund, Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV, LF Greenmount Fund, London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund, MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme, National Pension Service, Permodalan Nasional Berhard, Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan, Staffordshire Pension Fund, State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board (MATERESE, JOSHUA)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, granting #24 Letter application for the Pro Hac Vice admission of Matthew L. Mustokoff and Stephanie M. Grey; the $150.00 fee required by Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(3) for the pro hac admission to the District Court for the District of New Jersey shall also be paid to the Clerk of this Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/1/2019. (sms)
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Joseph T. Kelleher to Honorable Lena Dunn Wettre re: Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph T. Kelleher, #2 Certification of Matthew L. Mustokoff, #3 Certification of Stephanie M. Grey, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KELLEHER, JOSEPH)
March 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to John L. Hardiman and Michael P. Devlin $ 300, receipt number NEW039166. (sms)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA on behalf of Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds, Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC, Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund, Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Monceau, Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II, Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund, Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund, Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Aurion International Daily Equity Fund, City and County of Swansea Pension Fund, Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund, Devon County Council, Falkirk Council Pension Fund, Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio, Hydro One Pension Plan, I3 Global Equity Fund, Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV, LF Greenmount Fund, London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund, MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme, National Pension Service, Permodalan Nasional Berhard, Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan, Staffordshire Pension Fund, State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board (D'ANCONA, JOSHUA)
March 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, REED BRODSKY, DAVID F. CROWLEY-BUCK, ARIC WU, JAMES E. ANKLAM, JAMES D. WAREHAM and SAMUEL P. GRONER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms)
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Samuel P. Groner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Anklam to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James D. Wareham to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (NAAR, ALAN)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aric H. Wu to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, MARSHALL)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David F. Crowley-Buck to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, MARSHALL)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Reed Brodsky to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, MARSHALL)
March 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Reed Brodsky, Esq., Aric Wu, Esq., and David F. Crowley-Buck, Esq. $ 450, receipt number NEW039064. (sms)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John L. Hardiman and Michael P. Delvin; Counsel shall make payment to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection, pursuant to New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2(a); and counsel shall make payment to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for admission pro hac vice in accordance with Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/22/2019. (sms)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JUDY L. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Statement As to Why No Brief Is Necessary, #2 Certification of Brian Frawley, #3 Certification of John Hardiman, #4 Certification of Michael Devlin, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY on behalf of JUDY L. BROWN (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, granting #12 Letter application for the Pro Hac Vice admission of Reed Brodsky, Esq., Aric Wu, Esq., and David F. Crowley-Buck, Esq.; each shall make payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court in accordance with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(3); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 03/18/2019. (sms)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Marshall R. King to the Honorable Lena Dunn Wettre re: request for admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marshall R. King, #2 Certification of Reed Brodsky, #3 Certification of Aric Wu, #4 Certification of David F. Crowley-Buck, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(KING, MARSHALL)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MARSHALL R. KING on behalf of JOSEPH C PAPA (KING, MARSHALL)
March 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to James D. Wareham, Esq., James E. Anklam, Esq. and Samuel P. Groner, Esq. $ 450.00, receipt number NEW038955. (sms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERRIGO COMPANY PLC identifying Perrigo Company plc as Corporate Parent.. (NAAR, ALAN)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter/Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of JAMES D. WAREHAM, ESQ.; JAMES E. ANKLAM, ESQ.; and SAMUEL P. GRONER, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/4/2019. (dam, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Alan S. Naar. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Alan S. Naar, #2 Certification of James D. Wareham, #3 Certification of James E. Anklam, #4 Certification of Samuel P. Groner, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(NAAR, ALAN)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Civil Action No. 19-6560 shall be reopened by the Clerk as it was closed in error. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 3/1/2019. (sm)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint shall be extended until forty-five (45) days following the resolution of the Individual Actions Motions to Dismiss; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 02/26/2019. (sms)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Alan S. Naar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(NAAR, ALAN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN S. NAAR on behalf of PERRIGO COMPANY PLC (NAAR, ALAN)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor previously assigned in error and are no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/26/19. (ak, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C PAPA, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ys, )
February 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JUDY L. BROWN, JOSEPH C PAPA, PERRIGO COMPANY PLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9440195) with JURY DEMAND, filed by London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund, Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund, I3 Global Equity Fund, City and County of Swansea Pension Fund, Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds, Devon County Council, National Pension Service, Aurion International Daily Equity Fund, Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan, LF Greenmount Fund, Permodalan Nasional Berhard, Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio, Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II, Hydro One Pension Plan, Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund, State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board, Aberdeen Monceau, Staffordshire Pension Fund, Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund, MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme, Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds, Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund, Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC, Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV, Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund, Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC, Falkirk Council Pension Fund, Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KELLEHER, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABERDEEN CANADA FUNDS-GLOBAL EQUITY FUND et al v. PERRIGO COMPANY PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Funds
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desjardins Global Equity Value Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Life Global (ex UK) Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Northern American Equity Enhanced Index Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds UK ICVC II
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Standard International Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydro One Pension Plan
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen World Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Pension Service
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Monceau
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Global - World Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Islamic World Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon County Council
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Standard Fully Hedged International Equities Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islamic Global Equity Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Islamic SICAV
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staffordshire Pension Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Life World Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Canada 2007 Pension Plan
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Idaho Endowment Fund Investment Board
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: London Borough of Hounslow Superannuation Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Canada Funds - Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Canada Funds
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Permodalan Nasional Berhard
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LF Greenmount Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Multi Asset Fund, a sub-fund of Aberdeen Investment Funds ICVC
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I3 Global Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampshire County Council - Global Equity Portfolio
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of Swansea Pension Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Standard Actively Hedged International Equities Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurion International Daily Equity Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falkirk Council Pension Fund
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTR Corporation Limited Retirement Scheme
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aberdeen Global Equity Fund, a series of Aberdeen Institutional Commingled Funds, LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER
Represented By: JOSHUA ANGELO MATERESE
Represented By: JOSHUA EDWARD D'ANCONA
Represented By: MICHELLE M. NEWCOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY L. BROWN
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO COMPANY PLC
Represented By: ALAN S. NAAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH C PAPA
Represented By: MARSHALL R. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?