BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: HANHE CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC and NAM MIN CHO
Case Number: 2:2019cv06954
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by HANHE CHO, NAM MIN CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/2/19. (nic, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BUTERICK, BRETT)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK on behalf of HANHE CHO, NAM MIN CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC (BUTERICK, BRETT)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN on behalf of HANHE CHO, NAM MIN CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC (GOLDMAN, EVAN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on SB Hospitality Palm Springs, LLC and Nam Min Cho on 3/28/19, filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. HANHE CHO served on 3/31/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HANHE CHO, NAM MIN CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
February 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK EUGENE DURING on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (DURING, PATRICK)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANHE CHO, NAM MIN CHO, SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9450649), filed by BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC. v. SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANHE CHO
Represented By: BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK
Represented By: EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB HOSPITALITY PALM SPRINGS, LLC
Represented By: BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK
Represented By: EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAM MIN CHO
Represented By: BRETT MICHAEL BUTERICK
Represented By: EVAN MATTHEW GOLDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYMONT FRANCHISE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: PATRICK EUGENE DURING
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?