D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC. v. THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. et al

Plaintiff: D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC.
Defendant: THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. and PATEK PHILIPPE S.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07967
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1345ij
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 4/22/2019. (kd)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER - Per counsels' request, the Telephone Conference set for 4/10/2019 is rescheduled to 4/22/2019 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/10/2019. (kd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 4/10/2019 at 10:30 am before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/5/2019. (kd)
April 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 4/5/2019. (kd)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER As previously discussed with counsel, there shall be a settlement conference before the Court on April 5, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. before the undersigned. Any ex parte settlement position letters the parties wish to send should be submitted on or before April 4, 2019 at noon to ldw_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/2/19. (Wettre, Leda)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Michael H. Freeman, Esq. to Leda Dunn Wettre, U.S.M.J.. (FREEMAN, MICHAEL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 3/29/2019. (kd)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/28/2019. (ld, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Order on Consent)(SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/26/2019. (kd)
March 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 4/15/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (FREEMAN, MICHAEL)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC.. Responses due by 3/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael H. Freeman, #2 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FREEMAN, MICHAEL)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION as to briefing schedule by PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC.. (HARVEY, LINDA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL L. REBA on behalf of PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. (REBA, SHERYL)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL H. FREEMAN on behalf of PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. (FREEMAN, MICHAEL)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDA G. HARVEY on behalf of PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. (HARVEY, LINDA)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Marisa Rauchway Sverdlov. (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC. re #1 Complaint,,, Brief, and Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to case. (jr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
March 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC.. (SVERDLOV, MARISA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATEK PHILIPPE S.A., THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9476218) with JURY DEMAND, filed by D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint, #12 Brief Plaintiff's Brief in Support of its Application by Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction, #13 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause)(SVERDLOV, MARISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC. v. THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HENRI STERN WATCH AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: LINDA G. HARVEY
Represented By: SHERYL L. REBA
Represented By: MICHAEL H. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATEK PHILIPPE S.A.
Represented By: LINDA G. HARVEY
Represented By: SHERYL L. REBA
Represented By: MICHAEL H. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'AMORE JEWELERS, INC.
Represented By: MARISA RAUCHWAY SVERDLOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?