Stevens v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lee Stevens
Defendant: Zimmer U.S., Inc., ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC. and ZIMMER, INC.
In Re: ZIMMER DUROM HIP CUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv08011
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (as, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/13/16. (gh, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/23/10. (gh, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL (gh, )
March 7, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (gh, )
March 7, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 3/6/19, for MDL 2158 ZIMMER DUROM HIP CUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:19-cv-00046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-134): Pursuant to Rule 7. I of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 2$ U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of June 9,2010, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton. (CME, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Documents from Superior Court by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Lee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Baxter, Lee)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Lee)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet. (Baxter, Lee)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-19-04809 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015454), filed by Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Stevens
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ZIMMER DUROM HIP CUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?