WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. v. JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-100, JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-100, PHV CHRISTOPHER M. VERDINI, ANTHONY SIMMONS, DEVON BROWN, MITCHELL J. SLATER, LOUIS E. MOORE, TYREAK RUSH, ANDRE OQUINN, ERIC D. MOORE, LILLAR R. HAYES and PARIS E. LEACRAFT
Case Number: 2:2019cv09039
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Bond Number 107024576 filed on April 2, 2019 is dismissed. (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/7/20. (jc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TOR, LOLY)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 4/20/2020 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/24/2020. (kd)
January 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 1/24/2020. (kd)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/3/2020. (kd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. re #19 Notice of Call for dismissal,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher M. Verdini to Show Good Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed)(TOR, LOLY)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 10/15/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cds)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/15/2019. (JB, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/15/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella.) (cds)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 Exhibit to #15 Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen (Unredacted Copy Filed Under Seal) by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 2))(TOR, LOLY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lauren Dienes-Middlen (Supplemental) by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 (Personal Identifiers Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2)(TOR, LOLY)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. of filing of proposed Preliminary Injunction and Order for Seizure of Counterfeit Goods (TOR, LOLY)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERIC D. MOORE, ANTHONY SIMMONS, LOUIS E. MOORE, LILLAR R. HAYES, ANDRE OQUINN, PARIS E. LEACRAFT, DEVON BROWN, MITCHELL J. SLATER, TYREAK RUSH, filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(TOR, LOLY)
April 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER M. VERDINI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher M. Verdini to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9567968.) (TOR, LOLY)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Letter from World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., regarding Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher M. Verdini, Esq., etc (JB, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (JB, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ld, )
April 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5C before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. (cds)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., regarding Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher M. Verdini, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Loly G. Tor in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher M. Verdini, Esq., #2 Certification of Christopher M. Verdini, Esq., in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TOR, LOLY)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (th, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., requesting adjournment of April 3, 2019 hearing date re #5 Order to Show Cause,. (TOR, LOLY)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER FOR SEZURE OF COUNTERFEIT MARKED GOODS, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/3/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5C before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. It is further ordered, that this Order is conditioned upon Plaintiff's Corporate security bond or other from approved by the Court, in the amount of $10,000.00, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/29/2019. (JB, )
March 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order for Seizure of Counterfeit Marked Goods, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibits 1-5 to Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen, #4 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen, #5 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen (part 1), #6 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen (part 2), #7 Exhibits 8-10 to Declaration of Lauren Dienes-Middlen, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6)(TOR, LOLY)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order for Seizure of Counterfeit Marked Goods, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Loly G. Tor, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TOR, LOLY)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (TOR, LOLY)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-100, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-100 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9535034) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(TOR, LOLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC. v. JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOE 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV CHRISTOPHER M. VERDINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL J. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS E. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYREAK RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE OQUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC D. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILLAR R. HAYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARIS E. LEACRAFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLD WRESTLING ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?