MONA MIKALSEN v. NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC., et al
Plaintiff: MONA MIKALSEN
Defendant: NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC., XYZ CORPORATION 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, Hudson Home Health Care, Inc. d/b/a National Seating & Mobility, NE and improperly plead as "National Seating & Mobility NE" and INVACARE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv12198
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 7/23/2019 03:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/18/2019. (spc, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by INVACARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CARTON, CHRISTOPHER)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Hudson Home Health Care, Inc. d/b/a National Seating & Mobility, NE and improperly plead as "National Seating & Mobility NE". (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by INVACARE CORPORATION, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/31/2019. (JB, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Hudson Home Health Care, Inc. d/b/a "National Seating & Mobility NE" and improperly plead as "National Seating & Mobility NE" re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #11 Response in Support of Motion, #8 Response to Motion, #10 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (LEE, SUNA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support filed by INVACARE CORPORATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CARTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit A)(CAPOZZI, EDWARD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC. identifying National Seating & Mobility, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (on behalf of Hudson Home Health Care, Inc. d/b/a National Seating & Mobility, NE and improperly plead as "National Seating & Mobility NE" (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
May 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ERICA SINGER MEKLES on behalf of INVACARE CORPORATION (MEKLES, ERICA)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by INVACARE CORPORATION. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CARTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/27/2019. (JB, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC. (LEE, SUNA)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON on behalf of INVACARE CORPORATION (CARTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
May 7, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC.. (LEE, SUNA)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC. from Essex County Superior Court, case number ESX-L-2418-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9644644), filed by NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEE, SUNA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONA MIKALSEN v. NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SEATING & MOBILITY, INC.
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATION 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Home Health Care, Inc. d/b/a National Seating & Mobility, NE and improperly plead as "National Seating & Mobility NE"
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVACARE CORPORATION
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA MIKALSEN
Represented By: EDWARD P. CAPOZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?