CHOI v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: MISA CHOI
Defendant: JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., a Delaware corporation, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-100 and LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12236
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Stipulation and ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/4/2019. (byl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by MISA CHOI. (LIM, JOSHUA)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/23/2019, Replies due by 9/30/2019. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/21/2019. (jr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint , #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, with the consent of Defense counsel, by MISA CHOI. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #17 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike. Responses due by 8/26/2019 Replies due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 7/31/2019. (byl)
July 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint with consent of all parties. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint with consent of all parties by MISA CHOI. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
July 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kenneth Kirschner to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9846956.) (JACOBS, JESSICA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC. identifying LG Electronics, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BARON, DAVID)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike #13 Amended Complaint by JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BARON, DAVID)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KENNETH KIRSCHNER. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/24/2019. (dam, )
July 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The affidavit of Kenneth Kirschner submitted by Jessica Jacobs on 7/23/2019 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (vm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Kirschner by JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kenneth Kirschner, #2 Certification of Jessica K. Jacobs, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JACOBS, JESSICA)
July 18, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 9/30/2019 10:45 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/17/2019. (spc, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOOWAN CHO, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-100, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC., filed by MISA CHOI.(LIM, JOSHUA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA KLARFELD JACOBS on behalf of JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC. (JACOBS, JESSICA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit to #1 Complaint (NOTICE OF CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF) by MISA CHOI. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond up to and including July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/3/2019. (byl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC.. (BARON, DAVID)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. BARON on behalf of JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC. (BARON, DAVID)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MISA CHOI. LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MISA CHOI. JOOWAN CHO served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
May 7, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by MISA CHOI as to JOOWAN CHO. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by MISA CHOI as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., a Delaware corporation. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint , Civil Cover Sheet, by MISA CHOI. (KWAK, SEOKCHAN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOOWAN CHO, LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., a Delaware corporation ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9647120) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MISA CHOI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWAK, SEOKCHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHOI v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISA CHOI
Represented By: SEOKCHAN KWAK
Represented By: JOSHUA SEOUNG YOUNG LIM
Represented By: PETER BORIS MELAMED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOOWAN CHO
Represented By: JESSICA KLARFELD JACOBS
Represented By: DAVID J. BARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS, U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: JESSICA KLARFELD JACOBS
Represented By: DAVID J. BARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?