PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC v. CASTILLO et al

Plaintiff: PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC D/B/A MOMENTUM SOLAR and PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC
Defendant: SEBASTIAN CAICEDO, KARLA MERCEDES, MICHAEL WALDT, TYLER CASTILLO, KEISHLA ROSADO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, RYAN ROVNAK, DANIEL LOPEZ, SORIAH SIDAUI, DONALD CASTILLO, FELIPE CARO, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 and JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv12469
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conferencefor 7/31/2019 10:45 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 6/28/2019. (spc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by SEBASTIAN CAICEDO, FELIPE CARO, DONALD CASTILLO, TYLER CASTILLO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, DANIEL LOPEZ, KARLA MERCEDES, KEISHLA ROSADO, RYAN ROVNAK, SORIAH SIDAUI, MICHAEL WALDT. (BARREIRO, DARREN)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Transcript of Hearing on Order to Show Cause held on May 29, 2019, before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Court Reporter: Joanne Sekella (908-310-1177). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 6/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (mfr)
May 31, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MICHAEL WALDT, SORIAH SIDAUI, TYLER CASTILLO, FELIPE CARO, DANIEL LOPEZ, KARLA MERCEDES, DONALD CASTILLO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, KEISHLA ROSADO, RYAN ROVNAK, SEBASTIAN CAICEDO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/21/2019. (JB, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (OBRADOVIC, MAJA)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying, Order to show cause seeking preliminary injunction for reasons set forth on the record, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/29/2019. (JB, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton: Order to Show Cause Hearing on the plaintiffs application for a preliminary injunction [D.E. #7] held on 5/29/2019. Opinion read into the record. Ordered application denied. (Court Reporter Joanne Sekella) (ps, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel to Judge Wigenton enclosing Plaintiffs Reply in Further Support of Order to Show Cause re #13 Answer to Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 a.Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Further Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 b.Certification of Ken Dileo, #3 c.Certification of John Campbell, #4 Certification of Service)(CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants re #13 Answer to Complaint,, Defendants' Opposition to Order to Show Cause (OBRADOVIC, MAJA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Brief In Opposition to Order to Show Cause by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Maja M. Obradovic in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause, #2 Certification of Austin Thompson, #3 Certification of Dane Nielsen, #4 Certification Karla Mercedes Maldonado, #5 Certification Soriah Sidaui, #6 Certification of Ryan Rovnak, #7 Certification of Daniel Lopez, #8 Certification of Christian Fernandez, #9 Certification of Felipe Caro, #10 Certification of Michael Waldt, #11 Certification of Sebastian Caicedo, #12 Certification of Tyler Castillo, #13 Certification of Donald Castillo)(OBRADOVIC, MAJA)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 5/29/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. As to why an Order for preliminary injunction shall not be enter. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2019, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/21/2019. (JB, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Momentums counsel to Judge Wigenton providing Plaintiffs unexecuted Order to Show Cause re #7 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 unexecuted Order to Show Cause)(CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Maja M. Obradovic in reply to OTSC. (OBRADOVIC, MAJA)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Counsel for Momentum to Judge Wigenton enclosing Proposed Order for Pending Order to Show Cause re #7 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC D/B/A MOMENTUM SOLAR. (CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9669516) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC D/B/A MOMENTUM SOLAR. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause Executed by State Court on May 3, 2019, #2 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause, #3 Certification of Service regarding Plaintiffs Service of the DRAFT Order to Show Cause, #4 Certification of Service regarding Plaintiffs Service of the Order to Show Cause Executed by State Court on May 3, 2019, #5 Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #3 Letter: The Court is in receipt of counsels letter dated May 13, 2019 (D.E. 3) regarding the removal of the Order to Show Cause originally filed in state court. Plaintiffs counsel is advised that it must refile its Order to Show Cause directly on this Courts docket and provide Chambers with courtesy copies. Once the filing is properly docketed, the Court will advise counsel as to how this matter will proceed. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/15/19. (cds)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM on behalf of SEBASTIAN CAICEDO, FELIPE CARO, DONALD CASTILLO, TYLER CASTILLO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, DANIEL LOPEZ, KARLA MERCEDES, KEISHLA ROSADO, RYAN ROVNAK, SORIAH SIDAUI, MICHAEL WALDT (ALAM, PUNAM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC on behalf of All Defendants (OBRADOVIC, MAJA)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from John P. Campbell to Judge Wigenton re: Status of Pending Order to Show Cause Prior to Removal re #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Certification of Service & Proposed Order for Pending OTSC))(CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. CAMPBELL on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CAMPBELL, JOHN)
May 13, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL WALDT, SORIAH SIDAUI, TYLER CASTILLO, FELIPE CARO, DANIEL LOPEZ, KARLA MERCEDES, DONALD CASTILLO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, KEISHLA ROSADO, RYAN ROVNAK, SEBASTIAN CAICEDO from Superior Court of NJ, Chancery Division, Middlesex County, case number MID-C-71-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9658644), filed by MICHAEL WALDT, SORIAH SIDAUI, TYLER CASTILLO, FELIPE CARO, DANIEL LOPEZ, KARLA MERCEDES, DONALD CASTILLO, CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ, KEISHLA ROSADO, RYAN ROVNAK, SEBASTIAN CAICEDO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (part 1), #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (part 2), #3 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (part 3), #4 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (part 4), #5 Certificate of Service)(BARREIRO, DARREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC v. CASTILLO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEBASTIAN CAICEDO
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARLA MERCEDES
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WALDT
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER CASTILLO
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEISHLA ROSADO
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN FERNANDEZ
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ROVNAK
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL LOPEZ
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SORIAH SIDAUI
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD CASTILLO
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIPE CARO
Represented By: DARREN C. BARREIRO
Represented By: PUNAM PANCHAL ALAM
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Represented By: MAJA MOJSILOVIC OBRADOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC D/B/A MOMENTUM SOLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRO CUSTOM SOLAR, LLC
Represented By: JOHN P. CAMPBELL
Represented By: MICHAEL J. MAROTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?