SALAS et al v. IBRO et al
Plaintiff: VERONICA PACHECO and GUADENCIO SALAS
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100 (Names being fictitious), KASIKOVIC IBRO, SBR TRANSPORT, LLC, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 (names being fictitious) and GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv12543
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER extending the time within which defendants Zachary Kane and Lisa Kane can file an answer within 14 days from the date of this Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/8/2019. (sm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from GEICO Indemnity Company. (MALYSO, SCOTT)
June 19, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 7/17/19 at 10:45am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/19/19. (tjg, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SBR Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 (names being fictitious), GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, JOHN DOES 1-100 (Names being fictitious) by KASIKOVIC IBRO, SBR TRANSPORT, LLC.(DOBBS, MARYJANE)
May 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by KASIKOVIC IBRO, SBR TRANSPORT, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/5/2019. (Ti)
May 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY JANE BORDENS on behalf of KASIKOVIC IBRO, SBR TRANSPORT, LLC (BORDENS, EMILY)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants KBR Transport, LLC and Karisovic Ibro.. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SBR TRANSPORT, LLC. (DOBBS, MARYJANE)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SBR TRANSPORT, LLC, KASIKOVIC IBRO from Superior Court of Union County, NJ, case number UNN L 000909 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9667820), filed by SBR TRANSPORT, LLC, KASIKOVIC IBRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DOBBS, MARYJANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAS et al v. IBRO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100 (Names being fictitious)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KASIKOVIC IBRO
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBR TRANSPORT, LLC
Represented By: EMILY JANE BORDENS
Represented By: MARYJANE MCNICHOLAS DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 (names being fictitious)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA PACHECO
Represented By: JERRY EISDORFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUADENCIO SALAS
Represented By: JERRY EISDORFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?