LEE v. HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: CRESSIE LEE
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D and HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv12554
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/18/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/14/2019. (kd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION.(NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRESSIE LEE. HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (HERBERT, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION, JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9668258) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CRESSIE LEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERBERT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKENSACK BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: HOWARD M. NIRENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRESSIE LEE
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?